E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6869
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5051
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5117
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4564
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6362
|
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1643
|
Journal Page: 6361
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6361
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4563
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4380
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3996
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3996
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5854
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5854
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5397
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5397
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5397
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3474
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3474
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 3474
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3474
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3470
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2485
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4076
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1133
|
Journal Page: 4076
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4076
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Amended
|
2-Fletcher
|
Journal Page: 4073
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4073
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3991
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3990
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1107
|
Journal Page: 3990
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
3-D. Howard
|
Journal Page: 3985
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Amended
|
2-S. King
|
Journal Page: 3983
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
1-D. Howard
|
Journal Page: 3983
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2 and Rule 8, Section 4
|
Journal Page: 3983
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-D. Howard
|
Journal Page: 3978
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3978
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1642
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 1109
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1109
|
House
|
03/17/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 902
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 643
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 594
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 594
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 594
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 594
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 594
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 594
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 594
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 391
|
Senate
|
02/15/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 217
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 217
|
Senate
|
11/08/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2010
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|