Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1085
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1046
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 702
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 702
|
Senate
|
03/10/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|