House
|
05/21/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 5047
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 4060
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 4060
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3828
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2309
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2245
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2245
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2245
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2245
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2245
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2245
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2244
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2147
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1916
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 941
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 703
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 703
|
Senate
|
03/11/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|