05/19/2011 | Referred to Ways & Means | |||
05/19/2011 | Read first time | |||
05/17/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |||
05/16/2011 | Received from the Senate | |||
05/16/2011 | Reported engrossed | |||
05/16/2011 | Passed | |||
05/16/2011 | Read 3rd time | |||
05/16/2011 | Record vote | |||
05/16/2011 | Three day rule suspended | |||
05/16/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |||
05/16/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | |||
05/16/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |||
05/16/2011 | Co-author authorized | |||
05/13/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | |||
05/11/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | |||
05/11/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |||
05/11/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | |||
05/04/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | |||
05/04/2011 | Considered in public hearing | |||
05/04/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |||
03/23/2011 | Referred to Economic Development | |||
03/11/2011 | Filed | |||
03/11/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |