House | 05/13/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/13/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/13/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/13/2011 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Referred to Appropriations | Journal Page: 3296 | |
House | 05/09/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3296 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3091 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2065 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1911 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1911 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1911 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1911 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1911 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1910 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Amendment(s) offered | FA12 Ogden | Journal Page: 1910 |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Amendment withdrawn | Journal Page: 1910 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Amended | Journal Page: 1910 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Amendment adopted as amended | FA6 Estes | Journal Page: 1907 |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Amendment amended | Journal Page: 1907 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Amendment to amendment offered | FA7 Duncan | Journal Page: 1907 |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1903 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1903 | |
Senate | 05/02/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1343 | |
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 703 | |
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 703 | |
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |