E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
E
|
05/31/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5140
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5149
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5070
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1688
|
Journal Page: 6515
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6515
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6457
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4565
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4565
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4450
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4085
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4085
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5968
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5968
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5962
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5962
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5962
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3971
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3971
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 3971
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3971
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3968
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3612
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1412
|
Journal Page: 5431
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 5431
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Amended
|
2-C. Anderson
|
Journal Page: 5430
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
1-C. Anderson
|
Journal Page: 5430
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5430
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 5183
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Amended
|
2-Woolley
|
Journal Page: 5181
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5181
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4338
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3393
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2382
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2382
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1223
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 868
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 819
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 819
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 819
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 818
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 818
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 818
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 818
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 789
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 218
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 218
|
Senate
|
11/08/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2010
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|