House
|
05/23/2011
|
Point of order sustained
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)(3)
|
Journal Page: 4917
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4917
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/23/11 8:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 4860
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4860
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 5048
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 4612
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Correction in referral
|
|
Journal Page: 4612
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
Journal Page: 4612
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 4612
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4617
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2976
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 2679
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2687
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2687
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2687
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2687
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2686
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 2686
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA22 Davis
|
Journal Page: 2686
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
FA13 Shapiro
|
Journal Page: 2685
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
FA21 Van de Putte
|
Journal Page: 2685
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2685
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Amendment amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2685
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Amendment to amendment tabled
|
|
Journal Page: 2684
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Amendment to amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 2679
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Vote reconsidered
|
FA5 Wentworth
|
Journal Page: 2662
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Returned to the Senate for further action
|
|
Journal Page: 4301
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Point of order sustained
|
Rule 8, Section 3; Article III, Section 35
|
Journal Page: 4301
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4301
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/19/11 3:30 PM
|
Journal Page: 4232
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/19/11 8:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 4140
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4140
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1109
|
Journal Page: 3992
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Calendars Committee rule adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 3992
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3992
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4125
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
Journal Page: 3649
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3649
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3520
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2195
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2123
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2123
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2123
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2123
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2123
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2123
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2123
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA12 Ogden
|
Journal Page: 2122
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
|
Journal Page: 2122
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 2122
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Amendment to amendment tabled
|
|
Journal Page: 2112
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
FA6 Davis
|
Journal Page: 2112
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Motion to table fails
|
|
Journal Page: 2111
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2089
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2089
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1343
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 703
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 703
|
Senate
|
03/11/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|