E
|
06/17/2011
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/31/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5140
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5149
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6873
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 5079
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5079
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5054
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6469
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6469
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4524
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4086
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4086
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 6011
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 6011
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5960
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5960
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5960
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3809
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3809
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 3809
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3809
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3801
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3613
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5424
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1406
|
Journal Page: 5424
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 5424
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Amended
|
2-Alonzo
|
Journal Page: 5423
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5423
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5171
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 5171
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Amended
|
4-Brown
|
Journal Page: 5169
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5167
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4765
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
Journal Page: 3649
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3649
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3651
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2270
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2222
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2222
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2222
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2222
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2221
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2221
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
|
Journal Page: 2221
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA4 Watson
|
Journal Page: 2220
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 2220
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2219
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2218
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2218
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2064
|
Senate
|
05/02/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 704
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 704
|
Senate
|
03/11/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|