E | 06/17/2011 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/17/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5151 | |
E | 05/26/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4034 | |
House | 05/26/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5957 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3772 | |
Senate | 05/23/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3527 | |
Senate | 05/23/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 3153 | |
House | 05/23/2011 | Record vote | RV#1281 | Journal Page: 4831 |
House | 05/23/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 4831 | |
House | 05/23/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4831 | |
House | 05/21/2011 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4725 | |
House | 05/21/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4725 | |
House | 05/20/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3527 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 2547 | |
House | 04/29/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2547 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2387 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1603 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1380 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1380 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1380 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1380 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1380 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1380 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1380 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1134 | |
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 705 | |
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 705 | |
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |