E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6869
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5042
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5039
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6279
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4115
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4115
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4115
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4113
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3613
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5446
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1425
|
Journal Page: 5445
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5445
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5445
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5269
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 5269
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Bonnen
|
Journal Page: 5269
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5269
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1384
|
Journal Page: 5268
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Amendment to amendment tabled
|
3-Menendez
|
Journal Page: 5268
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Amendment to amendment withdrawn
|
2-Menendez, S. Miller, Truitt, Madden, Kuempel, Scott, Hopson, Isaac, Smithee, Hilderbran, Darby, Sh
|
Journal Page: 5267
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-Bonnen
|
Journal Page: 5267
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5267
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4618
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3974
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2654
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Correction in referral
|
|
Journal Page: 2654
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Referred to Environmental Regulation
|
|
Journal Page: 2547
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2547
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1795
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1134
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1080
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1080
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1080
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1080
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1080
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1080
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1080
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Seliger
|
Journal Page: 1079
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1079
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1079
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1003
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 705
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 705
|
Senate
|
03/11/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|