Senate | 05/02/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1163 | |
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/06/2011 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 900 | |
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 710 | |
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 710 | |
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |