Senate | 03/28/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/22/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 389 | |
Senate | 02/15/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 331 | |
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 218 | |
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 218 | |
Senate | 11/08/2010 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/08/2010 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |