House | 05/16/2011 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 4060 | |
House | 05/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4060 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3967 | |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2376 | |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2284 | |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2284 | |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2284 | |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2284 | |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2283 | |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2283 | |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2283 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 2267 | |
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 2224 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 710 | |
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 710 | |
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |