House | 05/24/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/19/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4618 | |
House | 05/17/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/13/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3867 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | Journal Page: 3648 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3648 | |
House | 05/10/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3526 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2224 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2188 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2188 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2188 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2188 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2187 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2187 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Amended | Journal Page: 2187 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Duncan | Journal Page: 2170 |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2170 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2170 | |
Senate | 05/04/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1708 | |
Senate | 05/02/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/02/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 712 | |
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 712 | |
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |