E | 05/20/2011 | Effective on 9/1/11 | ||
E | 05/20/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2711 | |
E | 05/10/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2196 | |
House | 05/10/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3520 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2192 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2195 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2072 | |
House | 05/07/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3186 | |
House | 05/07/2011 | Record vote | RV#837 | Journal Page: 3186 |
House | 05/07/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 3186 | |
House | 05/07/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3186 | |
House | 05/06/2011 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3136 | |
House | 05/06/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3136 | |
House | 05/06/2011 | Laid out in lieu of companion | CSHB 3375 | Journal Page: 3136 |
House | 05/05/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/05/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3177 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/05/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/05/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2260 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2260 | |
House | 04/15/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1865 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1164 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1113 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1113 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1113 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1113 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1112 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1112 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1112 | |
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1048 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 713 | |
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 713 | |
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |