E
|
05/28/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/28/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5040
|
E
|
05/18/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2553
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4181
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2515
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2553
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4124
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2495
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2495
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2494
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2494
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2200
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3325
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#895
|
Journal Page: 3324
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3324
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3324
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#863
|
Journal Page: 3236
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3236
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3236
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
4-Y. Davis
|
Journal Page: 3235
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Amended
|
3-Turner
|
Journal Page: 3235
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3234
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3233
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 3610
|
Journal Page: 3233
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3202
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2385
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2385
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2262
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1375
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1317
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1317
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1317
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1317
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1317
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1317
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1316
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Carona
|
Journal Page: 1316
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1316
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1316
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1163
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 714
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 714
|
Senate
|
03/11/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|