House
|
05/25/2011
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 5414
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4765
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 4217
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 4217
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3967
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2376
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2280
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2280
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2280
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2280
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2280
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2280
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2280
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Davis
|
Journal Page: 2280
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2280
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2280
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1645
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 714
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 714
|
Senate
|
03/11/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|