Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1699 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Williams S.B. No. 1699
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2011; March 23, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland
 Security; April 29, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 April 29, 2011, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1699 By:  Williams


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to authorizing the use of an image verification system to
 determine whether an applicant for a driver's license or personal
 identification certificate is a fugitive from justice.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 521.059, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  The department may use the image verification system
 established under this section to ensure that the applicant is not a
 fugitive from justice, as defined by Section 38.01, Penal Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *