Senate | 04/05/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 769 | |
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/21/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 525 | |
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/17/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 360 | |
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 219 | |
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 219 | |
Senate | 11/08/2010 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/08/2010 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |