House
|
05/18/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4185
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Reported favorably as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3393
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3237
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2548
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2548
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1685
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1048
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1017
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1017
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1017
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1017
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1016
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1016
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1016
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Williams
|
Journal Page: 1016
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1016
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1016
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 868
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 715
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 715
|
Senate
|
03/11/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|