Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1707 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Lucio S.B. No. 1707
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2011; March 23, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland
 Security; April 18, 2011, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; April 18, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain comprehensive development agreements of
 regional mobility authorities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter G, Chapter 370, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 370.3055 to read as follows:
 Sec. 370.3055.  LIMITED AUTHORITY FOR CERTAIN PROJECTS USING
 COMPREHENSIVE DEVELOPMENT AGREEMENTS. Notwithstanding Sections
 370.305(d) and (f), an authority may enter into a comprehensive
 development agreement relating to improvements to State Highway 550
 from U.S. Highway 77/83 to State Highway 48.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *