House
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6873
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 5071
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5071
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4888
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4086
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4086
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5971
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5971
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5960
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5960
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5960
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3912
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3912
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 3912
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3912
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3832
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3368
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1347
|
Journal Page: 5066
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 5066
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Hartnett
|
Journal Page: 5066
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5066
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4918
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4918
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Amendment as amended withdrawn
|
29-Hughes
|
Journal Page: 4918
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 4918
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4917
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/23/11 8:35 PM
|
Journal Page: 4896
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)
|
Journal Page: 4896
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4895
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1308
|
Journal Page: 4895
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
29-Hughes
|
Journal Page: 4895
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Amendment amended
|
30-Hughes
|
Journal Page: 4894
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Point of order overruled (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 4894
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
29-Hughes
|
Journal Page: 4893
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
28-Eiland
|
Journal Page: 4893
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Amended
|
27-Gallego
|
Journal Page: 4891
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
23-Christian
|
Journal Page: 4887
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
21-Weber
|
Journal Page: 4881
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4871
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4860
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4338
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2907
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2385
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2385
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2263
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1375
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1313
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1313
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1313
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1312
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1312
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1312
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1312
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Duncan
|
Journal Page: 1311
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1311
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1311
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1342
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1163
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Referred to Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 716
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 716
|
Senate
|
03/11/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|