Senate | 05/18/2011 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/18/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/11/2011 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/04/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/04/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/04/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/04/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 1424 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Rereferred to committee | Journal Page: 1424 | |
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Referred to Veteran Affairs & Military Instal | Journal Page: 717 | |
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 717 | |
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |