House
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4765
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 3296
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3296
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3176
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2147
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1934
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1934
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1934
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1934
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1934
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1934
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1933
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1026
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 717
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 717
|
Senate
|
03/11/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|