E | 06/17/2011 | Effective on 9/1/11 | ||
E | 06/17/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5150 | |
E | 05/27/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4526 | |
House | 05/27/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6276 | |
05/26/2011 | Signed in the House | |||
Senate | 05/26/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4010 | |
Senate | 05/26/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4525 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 3574 | |
House | 05/25/2011 | Record vote | RV#1407 | Journal Page: 5425 |
House | 05/25/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 5425 | |
House | 05/25/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 5425 | |
House | 05/24/2011 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 5088 | |
House | 05/24/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 5088 | |
House | 05/23/2011 | Postponed | 5/23/11 11:30 PM | Journal Page: 5012 |
House | 05/23/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 5012 | |
House | 05/23/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/20/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/16/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/16/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4125 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/13/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/11/2011 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 05/11/2011 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 05/11/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 1150 | |
House | 03/30/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1150 | |
House | 03/21/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 921 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 643 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 603 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 603 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 603 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 602 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 602 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 602 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 602 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/07/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/07/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/07/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 486 | |
Senate | 03/02/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/02/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 219 | |
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 219 | |
Senate | 11/08/2010 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/08/2010 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |