House | 05/24/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/19/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4617 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/19/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/11/2011 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 05/11/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 2653 | |
House | 05/02/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2653 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2388 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1603 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1381 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1381 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1381 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1381 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1381 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1381 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1381 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1234 | |
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 718 | |
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 718 | |
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |