E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6869
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5042
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5039
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6280
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4155
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4155
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4155
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4154
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3121
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1279
|
Journal Page: 4830
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4830
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4830
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4722
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4722
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4125
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2303
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2260
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2260
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2169
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1344
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1290
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1290
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1290
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1290
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1290
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1290
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1290
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1026
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Referred to Veteran Affairs & Military Instal
|
|
Journal Page: 718
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 718
|
Senate
|
03/11/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|