Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1741 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Fraser S.B. No. 1741
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2011; March 23, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources;
 April 13, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; April 13, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to tree mitigation fees imposed by municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 212, Local Government Code, is amended
 by adding Subchapter H to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER H.  MUNICIPAL TREE MITIGATION FEE
 Sec. 212.191.  APPLICABILITY.  This subchapter applies to a
 municipality that requires as a condition for approval of a permit
 that an applicant pay the municipality or a third party a tree
 mitigation fee.
 Sec. 212.192.  AMOUNT OF MUNICIPAL TREE MITIGATION FEE. A
 municipality that requires a tree mitigation fee to offset the
 impact of an activity that a municipal permit authorizes must set
 the fee in an amount that is roughly proportionate to the impact
 that the activity will have on the public.
 Sec. 212.193.  FILING OF APPEAL WITH MUNICIPALITY. A permit
 applicant may appeal the amount of a tree mitigation fee set by a
 municipality under this subchapter by filing an appeal with the
 governing body of the municipality.  The appeal must be in writing
 and specify the grounds for the appeal.
 Sec. 212.194.  HEARING ON APPEAL TO MUNICIPALITY. (a)  Not
 later than the 30th day after the date the notice of appeal is filed
 under Section 212.193, the governing body of the municipality shall
 set a hearing for the appeal.
 (b)  At the hearing the permit applicant may present evidence
 and witness testimony that is relevant to the tree mitigation fee
 determination.
 (c)  The permit applicant may appear at the hearing in person
 or by agent or attorney.
 (d)  Not later than the 30th day after the date the hearing
 concludes, the governing body shall make a final determination
 regarding the amount of the tree mitigation fee.
 Sec. 212.195.  APPEAL TO COUNTY OR DISTRICT COURT. (a)  Not
 later than the 30th day after the date the final determination is
 made under Section 212.194, a permit applicant may appeal the
 determination to a county or district court in the county in which
 the activity to be permitted will occur.
 (b)  The municipality shall have the burden of proof to
 establish that the amount of the tree mitigation fee is roughly
 proportionate to the impact that the activity to be permitted will
 have on the public.
 (c)  The court shall award attorney's fees and costs of court
 to a permit applicant who prevails in a suit under this section.
 Sec. 212.196.  NO WAIVER OF RIGHT TO APPEAL.  (a)  A
 municipality may not require a permit applicant to waive a right of
 appeal under this subchapter as a condition for approval of a
 permit.
 (b)  A permit applicant who pays a contested tree mitigation
 fee does not waive a right of appeal under this subchapter by taking
 an action authorized by a permit issued by the municipality.
 Sec. 212.197.  APPLICATION OF LAW RELATED TO CAPITAL
 IMPROVEMENTS. This subchapter does not diminish the authority or
 modify the procedures specified by Chapter 395.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (b) of
 this section, the changes in law made by Subchapter H, Chapter 212,
 Local Government Code, as added by this Act, apply only to a tree
 mitigation fee assessed by a municipality on or after the effective
 date of this Act.
 (b)  The changes in law made by Subchapter H, Chapter 212,
 Local Government Code, as added by this Act, apply to a contested
 tree mitigation fee assessed by a municipality before the effective
 date of this Act if an appeal of the amount of the fee has not been
 finally determined or adjudicated on the effective date of this
 Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *