Senate | 04/11/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1025 | |
Senate | 04/06/2011 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 719 | |
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 719 | |
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |