Senate | 05/17/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Motion withdrawn | Journal Page: 2214 | |
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Motion to suspend regular order of business | Journal Page: 2214 | |
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1920 | |
Senate | 05/04/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/04/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/04/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 721 | |
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 721 | |
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |