Senate | 05/19/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2064 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/02/2011 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/02/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 721 | |
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 721 | |
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |