E | 05/28/2011 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/28/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5040 | |
E | 05/18/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2553 | |
House | 05/17/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4118 | |
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2469 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2510 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2338 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3867 | |
05/13/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |||
House | 05/13/2011 | Record vote | RV#1044 | Journal Page: 3867 |
House | 05/13/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 3867 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3867 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3858 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3858 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB3799 | Journal Page: 3858 |
House | 05/13/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/13/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/12/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3968 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/12/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/12/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 3297 | |
House | 05/09/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3297 | |
House | 05/06/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3176 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2147 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1931 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1931 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1931 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1931 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1931 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1931 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Amended | Journal Page: 1931 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Lucio | Journal Page: 1930 |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1930 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1930 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/04/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1428 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 761 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 761 | |
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |