E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
E
|
05/27/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4526
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6276
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4036
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4525
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5963
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4013
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4013
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4013
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4012
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3121
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1268
|
Journal Page: 4811
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4811
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Laubenberg and Ritter
|
Journal Page: 4811
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4811
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4719
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4719
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Flynn
|
Journal Page: 4718
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4718
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2006
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1150
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1150
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1071
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 771
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 695
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 695
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 695
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 695
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 694
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 694
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 694
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Shapiro
|
Journal Page: 694
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 694
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 694
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 641
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 617
|
Senate
|
03/15/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 220
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 220
|
Senate
|
11/08/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2010
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|