Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
H. refuses to adopt conf. comm. rept-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5070
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6504
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1684
|
Journal Page: 6504
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
House refuses to adopt conference comm. rept.
|
|
Journal Page: 6504
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6458
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4577
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4577
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4473
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3719
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3719
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5742
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5742
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5398
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5398
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5398
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3489
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3489
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 3489
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3489
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3483
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3370
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5087
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1362
|
Journal Page: 5087
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 5087
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5086
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Amended
|
2-Marquez
|
Journal Page: 5085
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5080
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4808
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4808
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Raymond
|
Journal Page: 4808
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4808
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/23/11 3:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 4798
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4798
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4765
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Reported favorably as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Referred to Land & Resource Management
|
|
Journal Page: 3297
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3297
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2940
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2065
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1763
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1763
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1763
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1763
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1763
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1763
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1763
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1344
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Referred to International Relations and Trade
|
|
Journal Page: 762
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 762
|
Senate
|
03/11/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|