House | 05/12/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/12/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/12/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3968 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/11/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/11/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/11/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/11/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 2382 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2382 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1572 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1026 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 967 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 967 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 967 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 967 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 967 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 967 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 967 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 771 | |
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 220 | |
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 220 | |
Senate | 11/09/2010 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/09/2010 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |