Senate | 05/24/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2011 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 4761 | |
House | 05/21/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4761 | |
House | 05/21/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 4764 | |
Senate | 05/21/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3320 | |
Senate | 05/21/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2745 | |
Senate | 05/21/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2745 | |
Senate | 05/21/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2745 | |
Senate | 05/21/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2745 | |
Senate | 05/21/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2745 | |
Senate | 05/21/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2745 | |
Senate | 05/21/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2745 | |
Senate | 05/21/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/18/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/18/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/18/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2553 | |
Senate | 05/18/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2368 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 764 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 764 | |
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |