Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1837 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Van de Putte S.B. No. 1837
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2011; March 24, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 May 18, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; May 18, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to exemptions to persons required to hold a limited
 property and casualty license.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (c), Section 4051.101, Insurance
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (c)  This section does not apply to a person who wrote for the
 previous calendar year:
 (1)  policies authorized by Chapter 911 for a farm
 mutual insurance company that generated, in the aggregate, less
 than $50,000 in direct premium; [or]
 (2)  industrial fire insurance policies that
 generated, in the aggregate, less than $20,000 in direct premium;
 or
 (3)  policies authorized by Chapter 962 for an
 insurance company that generated, in the aggregate, less than
 $40,000 in direct premium.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *