House | 05/20/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/19/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4617 | |
House | 05/16/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/16/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/16/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 2910 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2910 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2796 | |
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1760 | |
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1703 | |
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1703 | |
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1703 | |
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1703 | |
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1703 | |
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1703 | |
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Amended | Journal Page: 1703 | |
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Amendment(s) offered | FA2 Wentworth | Journal Page: 1699 |
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Amendment withdrawn | Journal Page: 1699 | |
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1696 | |
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1696 | |
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Motion withdrawn | Journal Page: 1680 | |
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Motion to suspend regular order of business | Journal Page: 1680 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1234 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 764 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 764 | |
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |