House | 05/25/2011 | Postponed | 5/31/11 8:00 AM | Journal Page: 5474 |
House | 05/25/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 5474 | |
House | 05/24/2011 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 5375 | |
House | 05/24/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 5375 | |
House | 05/24/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/20/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4765 | |
House | 05/18/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/16/2011 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 4060 | |
House | 05/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4060 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3828 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2309 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2251 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2251 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2251 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2251 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2251 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2251 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2251 | |
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 2223 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 2195 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1024 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1002 | |
Senate | 04/06/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 962 | |
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 900 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 764 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 764 | |
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |