Senate | 05/04/2011 | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/04/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/27/2011 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/27/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 765 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 765 | |
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |