E | 05/09/2011 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/09/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2195 | |
E | 04/28/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1428 | |
House | 04/27/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2322 | |
Senate | 04/27/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1360 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1375 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1302 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Record vote | RV#503 | Journal Page: 2149 |
House | 04/21/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2149 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2149 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2139 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2139 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB2508 | Journal Page: 2139 |
House | 04/20/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2092 | |
House | 04/18/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1834 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1834 | |
House | 04/13/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1768 | |
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1134 | |
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1061 | |
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1061 | |
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1061 | |
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1060 | |
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1060 | |
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1060 | |
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1060 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1003 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 765 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 765 | |
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |