Senate | 05/19/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 2064 | |
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Reported from s/c favorably with substitute | ||
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Testimony taken in subcommittee | ||
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Subcommittee meeting cancelled | ||
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Referred to s/c by chair | ||
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 765 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 765 | |
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |