House
|
05/18/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4338
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2654
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2654
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2262
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1375
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1328
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1328
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1328
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1327
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1327
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1327
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1327
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Van de Putte
|
Journal Page: 1327
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1327
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1326
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1279
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1163
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 767
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 767
|
Senate
|
03/11/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|