E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
E
|
05/27/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4526
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6276
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4000
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4525
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3577
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5422
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5421
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1405
|
Journal Page: 5422
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5422
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5422
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 5416
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5416
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4765
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 3297
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3297
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3089
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2065
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1782
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1782
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1782
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1782
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1782
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1782
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1782
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1603
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 768
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 768
|
Senate
|
03/15/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|