House | 05/18/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4185 | |
House | 05/17/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 3297 | |
House | 05/09/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3297 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2940 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2065 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1763 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1763 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1763 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1763 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1763 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1763 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1763 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1427 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1344 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 778 | |
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 778 | |
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 778 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 615 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |