E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
E
|
05/21/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2977
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4761
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2777
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2977
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2635
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4215
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1160
|
Journal Page: 4215
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4215
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4215
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 4212
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4211
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4211
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB3810
|
Journal Page: 4211
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4125
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 3297
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3297
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3089
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2065
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1902
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1902
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1902
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1901
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1901
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1901
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1901
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1603
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 768
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 768
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|