E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
E
|
05/26/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4034
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5957
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3772
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3526
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3150
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4848
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1298
|
Journal Page: 4847
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4847
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4847
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4741
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4741
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4741
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2391
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1480
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1480
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1126
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 832
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 799
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 799
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 799
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 798
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 798
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 798
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 798
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 643
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 437
|
Senate
|
02/22/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 389
|
Senate
|
02/17/2011
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 365
|
Senate
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 365
|
Senate
|
02/16/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|