House
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3652
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2907
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 1150
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1150
|
House
|
03/17/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 902
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 643
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 594
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 594
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 594
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 594
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 594
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 594
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 594
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 504
|
Senate
|
03/07/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 486
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 221
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 221
|
Senate
|
11/09/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2010
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|