Senate | 05/19/2011 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Referred to Open Government, Select | Journal Page: 1131 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1131 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 1130 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |