05/18/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |||
05/17/2011 | Committee report distributed | |||
05/17/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |||
House | 05/16/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/16/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/16/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/16/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/16/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/13/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3960 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 3649 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3649 | |
House | 05/10/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3522 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2224 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2152 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2152 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2152 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2152 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2152 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2152 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2152 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1603 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Referred to Open Government, Select | Journal Page: 1161 | |
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1161 | |
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 1161 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |